RI H5916 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island health insurance market stability and consumer protection act in order to update state law to reflect current insurance standards, practice and regulation to maintain market stability.
Title
Health Insurance Coverage--market Stability And Consumer Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5916.pdf |