RI H5991 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting That The Rhode Island Office Of Energy Resources Improve Consumer Protection Related To Solar Energy Programs For Homeowners
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting That The Rhode Island Office Of Energy Resources Improve Consumer Protection Related To Solar Energy Programs For Homeowners
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5991.pdf |