RI H6035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Efficacy And Cost Of Implementing A Recycling Program For All Multi-family Residential Units, Including Condominium Complexes (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study The Efficacy And Cost Of Implementing A Recycling Program For Multi-family Residential Units From April 30, 2019, To April 30, 2020, And Expires On May 22, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Efficacy And Cost Of Implementing A Recycling Program For All Multi-family Residential Units, Including Condominium Complexes (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study The Efficacy And Cost Of Implementing A Recycling Program For Multi-family Residential Units From April 30, 2019, To April 30, 2020, And Expires On May 22, 2020.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6035.pdf |