RI H6053 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes public records program managed by administrator/state archivist for custody/disposal of state records assisted by 17 member advisory commission with civil penalties for violations.
Title
Public Records Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6053.pdf |