RI H6062 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retail establishments with 3 persons or more on premises without public restrooms to allow customers to use employee restrooms for certain medical conditions upon presentation of documentary proof with violators fined $250. Effective 1/1/20
Title
Restroom Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |