RI H6101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and expands the definitions of unfair claims practices committed by insurers with regard to physical inspection, performance of appraisals, retail valuation and total loss notification to owner.
Title
Unfair Claims Settlement Practices Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-12 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2019) |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |