RI H6112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-28 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-28 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state departments, agencies to promulgate rules and regulations prior to the first day of the next legislative session after passage with general assembly oversight committees to keep public record of same.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |