RI H6155 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a number of changes to the law governing sewer charges and assessments in the town of Coventry.
Title
In Amendment Of Chapter 330 Of The Public Laws Of 1997 As Amended By Chapter 140 Of The Public Laws Of 2006, Pertaining To Sewers In The Town Of Coventry
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | House read and passed |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2015) |
2015-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |