RI H6181 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the property tax classification for the town of Johnston to be consistent with state law.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes -- Johnston
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-06-07 | House | Meeting postponed (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |