RI H7039 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities--purchasing (would Make A Violation Of The Municipal Awarded Contracts A Misdemeanor.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities--purchasing (would Make A Violation Of The Municipal Awarded Contracts A Misdemeanor.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed as amended in concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-13 | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Senate Labor | |
2012-05-16 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-05-08 | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2012) | |
2012-02-29 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2012) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7039.pdf |