RI H7093 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2024)
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 2 House Health & Human Services Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2024)
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 2 House Health & Human Services Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations And Comments For Healthcare Liability Reform (this Resolution Creates A 15 Member Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations And Comments For Healthcare Liability Reform, And Who Would Report Back To The House By January 1, 2025, And Expire On February 1, 2025.)
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS AND COMMENTS FOR HEALTHCARE LIABILITY REFORM (This resolution creates a 15 member special legislative commission to study and provide recommendations and comments for healthcare liability reform, and who would report back to the House by January 1, 2025, and expire on February 1, 2025.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7093.pdf |