RI H7099 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- COMPREHENSIVE COMMUNITY -- POLICE RELATIONSHIP ACT OF 2015 - Amends the comprehensive community-police relationship act of 2015 to require an annual study by an outside agency chosen by the department.
Title
Amends the comprehensive community-police relationship act of 2015 to require an annual study by an outside agency chosen by the department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Motor And Other Vehicles
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- COMPREHENSIVE COMMUNITY
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- COMPREHENSIVE COMMUNITY -- POLICE RELATIONSHIP ACT OF 2015
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- COMPREHENSIVE COMMUNITY
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- COMPREHENSIVE COMMUNITY -- POLICE RELATIONSHIP ACT OF 2015
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7099.pdf |