RI H7105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES - Gives authority to the department of labor and training to enforce violations of the state purchases chapter and also adds penalties for those violations.
Title
Gives authority to the department of labor and training to enforce violations of the state purchases chapter and also adds penalties for those violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7105.pdf |