RI H7426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/05/2020)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/05/2020)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of comprehensive solar energy siting ordinances in each municipality of the state. The act would also allow the installation of master-meters in housing developments.
Title
Rhode Island Energy Resources Act
Sponsors
Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7426.pdf |