RI H7510 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- TAXICABS AND LIMITED PUBLIC MOTOR VEHICLES - Amends requirements regarding how taxicabs can be placed in service.
Title
Amends requirements regarding how taxicabs can be placed in service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- TAXICABS AND LIMITED PUBLIC MOTOR VEHICLES
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- TAXICABS AND LIMITED PUBLIC MOTOR VEHICLES
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7510.pdf |