RI H7522 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The United States Congress To Extend Funding For The Affordable Connectivity Program
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION RESPECTFULLY REQUESTING THE UNITED STATES CONGRESS TO EXTEND FUNDING FOR THE AFFORDABLE CONNECTIVITY PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Internet, & Technology: Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Internet, & Technology: Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |