RI H7556 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent the tax exemption for certain residential property developments which have either not been completed or, if completed, have not been sold/occupied which would have expired on December 31, 2021.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7556.pdf |