RI H7571 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Proposed Substitute
Hearing: Apr 30 House Judiciary Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Proposed Substitute
Hearing: Apr 30 House Judiciary Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- CASINO GAMING - Amends the law consistent with the advent of iGaming and new technology and codifies the payment of investigatory expenses incurred by the State in limited circumstances.
Title
Amends the law consistent with the advent of iGaming and new technology and codifies the payment of investigatory expenses incurred by the State in limited circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] |
Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7571.pdf |