RI H7622 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTERS - Requires the DOH and the EOHHS to collaborate with community health centers to establish new programs designed to attract federal funds, with a focus on the utilization of Teaching Health Center Graduate Medical Education programs.
Title
Requires the DOH and the EOHHS to collaborate with community health centers to establish new programs designed to attract federal funds, with a focus on the utilization of Teaching Health Center Graduate Medical Education programs.
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7622.pdf |