RI H7725 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- CERTIFICATION OF TEACHERS - Allows emergency preliminary certificates for teaching to be issued for up to a total of five (5) school years.
Title
Allows emergency preliminary certificates for teaching to be issued for up to a total of five (5) school years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2024-04-09 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-03-29 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |