RI H7876 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR MENTAL ILLNESS AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS - Outlines the insurance coverage standards, protocols and guidelines for medically necessary treatment of individuals with mental health or substance abuse use disorders.
Title
Outlines the insurance coverage standards, protocols and guidelines for medically necessary treatment of individuals with mental health or substance abuse use disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7876.pdf |