RI H7982 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES - Amends provisions relative to the application of zoning ordinances pertaining to wetland buffers to projects for development, redevelopment, construction or rehabilitation.
Title
Amends provisions relative to the application of zoning ordinances pertaining to wetland buffers to projects for development, redevelopment, construction or rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House read and passed |
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |