RI H8049 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Finance Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Finance Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This act serves as the enabling act required by ยง 16-7-44 of the general laws in order for the principal and interest on bonds issued in support of school housing projects to be eligible for state housing aid reimbursement.
Title
IN ACCORDANCE WITH RHODE ISLAND GENERAL LAWS SECTION 16-7-44 APPROVING THE ISSUANCE OF $125,000,000 GENERAL OBLIGATION BONDS, NOTES AND OTHER EVIDENCES OF INDEBTEDNESS OF THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE TO FINANCE THE CONSTRUCTION, RENOVATION, IMPROVEMENT, ALTERATION, REPAIR, LANDSCAPING, FURNISHING AND EQUIPPING OF SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL FACILITIES THROUGHOUT THE CITY AND ALL COSTS RELATED THERETO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8049.pdf |