RI H8077 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Municipal Government & Housing Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Municipal Government & Housing Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- MANAGEMENT AND DISPOSAL OF PROPERTY - Prohibits any state-chartered fire district from liquidating or disposing of any real or tangible property without first offering the property to the municipality in which the fire district is located.
Title
Prohibits any state-chartered fire district from liquidating or disposing of any real or tangible property without first offering the property to the municipality in which the fire district is located.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8077.pdf |