RI H8096 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- MERIT SYSTEM -- PERSONNEL ADMINISTRATION - Eliminates waiting periods for acceptance response for successful candidates, requires that all qualified candidates names be sent to the hiring agency, mandates given DHS social worker tests quarterly and extends DCYF pilot hiring program for 3/15/26.
Title
Eliminates waiting periods for acceptance response for successful candidates, requires that all qualified candidates names be sent to the hiring agency, mandates given DHS social worker tests quarterly and extends DCYF pilot hiring program for 3/15/26.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Public Officers And Employees
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- MERIT SYSTEM
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- MERIT SYSTEM -- PERSONNEL ADMINISTRATION
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- MERIT SYSTEM
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- MERIT SYSTEM -- PERSONNEL ADMINISTRATION
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8096.pdf |