RI H8100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits holders of a manufacture's license to sell at retail alcoholic beverages manufactured by them known for on/off-site consumption in an amount not in excess of 288 oz per visitor/per day, to be sold in bottles that hold no more than 72 oz each.
Title
Manufacturing And Wholesale Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/19/2016) |
2016-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |