RI H8145 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real and personal property located within the town of Middletown of Lucy's Hearth, a Rhode Island nonprofit corporation.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation--lucy's Hearth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Taxation - lucy's hearth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-02 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |