RI S0029 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state and municipalities to award bids for purchases of goods or services to the lowest responsive and responsible bidder whose bid is the lowest price.
Title
State Purchases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0029.pdf |