RI S0030 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Includes a tax sale as a transfer of property ownership that would trigger the past due balances of any PACE assessment.
Title
Property Assessed Clean Energy Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/09/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |