RI S0150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Johnston town council to add two (2) alternate members to its planning board.
Title
Johnston Planning Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Johnston planning board approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Johnston planning board approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |