RI S0198 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals (would Require Any Emergency Services System Operated By The Dcyf To Direct Families With Children In Need Of Behavioral Health Evaluations To Community-based Settings, Unless The Hospital Emergency Services Are Voluntarily Sought Or Medically Necessary.)
Title
An Act Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals (would Require Any Emergency Services System Operated By The Dcyf To Direct Families With Children In Need Of Behavioral Health Evaluations To Community-based Settings, Unless The Hospital Emergency Services Are Voluntarily Sought Or Medically Necessary.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0198.pdf |