RI S0208 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset provision of The Permanent Air Quality Monitoring Act from July 31, 2015 to July 31, 2017.
Title
The Permanent Air Quality Monitoring Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2015) |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2015) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |