RI S0233 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts volunteer fire companies under the supervision, control, or jurisdiction of another public body from certain posting requirements of the open meetings act.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |