RI S0239 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires persons in government custody use actual residence for census and redistricting purposes as determined by department of corrections and secretary of state.
Title
State Affairs And Government
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/04/2015) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |