RI S0292 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To Year Up Providence
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To Year Up Providence
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0292.pdf |