RI S0313 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting "the Whole Child Initiative"
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting "the Whole Child Initiative"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0313.pdf |