RI S0313 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the provisions of the general laws relating to the state car tax in order that the assessment of used motor vehicles would be based on the average trade-in price, rather than retail price.
Title
Motor Vehicle And Trailer Excise Tax Elimination Act Of 1998
Sponsors
Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0313.pdf |