RI S0401 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person from electronically disseminating visual images of another engaged in sexually explicit conduct or the intimate parts of another.
Title
Electronic Imaging Devices
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0401.pdf |