RI S0407 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of "Patient safety work product" to conform with the federal "Patient Safety and Quality Improvement Act of 2005".
Title
The Rhode Island Patient Safety Act Of 2008
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - The rhode island patient safety act of 2008 in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Ri patient safety act of 2008 approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Ri patient safety act of 2008 approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub B as amended |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B as amended |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House voted to recommit to House H.E.W. |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |