RI S0409 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants PUC authority to consider all utility profit in broader review to determine gas/electric utility rate of return (profit) and caps performance based profits.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2015) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2015) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |