RI S0476 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Underground Utility Contractors (would Establish Qualifications And Procedures To License Underground Utility Contractors. It Would Also Establish The Duties Of The Contractor's Registration And Licensing Board In Administering And Overseeing The Licensee.)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Underground Utility Contractors (would Establish Qualifications And Procedures To License Underground Utility Contractors. It Would Also Establish The Duties Of The Contractor's Registration And Licensing Board In Administering And Overseeing The Licensee.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0476.pdf |