RI S0479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Resource Recovery to waive tipping fees for solid waste collected by local watershed councils established and recognized by the Rhode Island Rivers Council
Title
Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0479.pdf |