RI S0508 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property - Commercial Leasing And Other Estates (would Prohibit Landlords Of Commercial Property From Limiting Or Restricting Who May Provide Services To Their Tenants.)
Title
An Act Relating To Property - Commercial Leasing And Other Estates (would Prohibit Landlords Of Commercial Property From Limiting Or Restricting Who May Provide Services To Their Tenants.)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/07/2013) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0508.pdf |