RI S0563 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that retirement contributions be deposited or remitted to the retirement system within three (3) days.
Title
Retirement System Contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |