RI S0595 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Cooperative Service Among School Districts: would provide that the Urban Collaborative Accelerated Program would receive state education funds under the new education aid formula in a manner similar to how the charter public schools receive their funding
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Cooperative Service Among School Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-14 | Committee heard | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-31 | Committee heard | |
2011-05-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0595.pdf |