RI S0728 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes references to minors in certain sections relative to domestic assault protective orders as the family court currently has jurisdiction over protective orders involving minors.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |