RI S0815 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Agriculture And Forestry -- Renewable Energy Facilities (would Regulate The Placement Of Renewable Energy Facilities On Farmlands.)
Title
An Act Relating To Agriculture And Forestry -- Renewable Energy Facilities (would Regulate The Placement Of Renewable Energy Facilities On Farmlands.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0815.pdf |