RI S0815 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings law to permit members of some public bodies to participate using videoconferencing technology.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government-- Open Meetings
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0815.pdf |