RI S0880 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the practice of importing a wild animal into the state, which animal is not native or indigenous to the state, for the purpose of conducting canned hunting
Title
Relating To Fish And Wildlife
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0880.pdf |