RI S0926 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages: would allow Patrick J. Droney to join Cali M. Laux and Anthony J. Parlapiano in marriage on or about July 6, 2012, within the Town of Middletown, Rhode Island
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-02 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-31 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-31 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-05-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-05-25 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0926.pdf |